CT SB00705 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-05 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-05 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow community spouses of institutionalized spouses to retain sufficient money to remain in their homes.
Title
An Act Concerning A Community Spouse's Allowable Assets.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-08 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Human Services |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services |
2015-03-19 | Senate | File Number 133 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 130 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/05 |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |