CT SB00683 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - House Calendar Number 513
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - House Calendar Number 513
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To create a monetary penalty for third-party entities that fail to make timely payments to state contractors.
Title
An Act Concerning A Penalty For Late Payments Of State Contractors By Third-party Entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 77 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | House Calendar Number 513 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-25 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7537 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | File Number 445 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 208 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |