CT SB00682 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To offer a financial incentive for state employees who report wasteful spending within the government.
Title
An Act Establishing A Reward Program For State Employee Reporting Of Wasteful Practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 226 AS AMENDED (Y: 104 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 129 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 129 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Public Act 19-10 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House Calendar Number 575 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8454 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | File Number 720 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 332 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |