CT SB00651 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-08 - Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-08 - Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide victims of domestic violence who may be in immediate danger with a set period of time to make provisions for their safety.
Title
An Act Concerning A Temporary Hold For Certain Family Violence Arrestees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/16 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |
Connecticut State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp |
Text | http://www.cga.ct.gov/2015/TOB/S/2015SB-00651-R00-SB.htm |
Text | http://www.cga.ct.gov/2015/TOB/S/2015SB-00651-R01-SB.htm |