CT SB00650 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-18 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-18 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To develop a one-stop support mechanism for parents whose children are exhibiting behavioral health issues.
Title
An Act Creating A Parents' Support Hotline For Parents Of Children Exhibiting Mental Or Behavioral Health Issues.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |