CT SB00644 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-07 - House Calendar Number 655
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-07 - House Calendar Number 655
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the in-state registration of motor vehicles registered out of state if such motor vehicles most frequently leave from or return to or remain in one or more points within the state.
Title
An Act Concerning The Registration Of Motor Vehicles Registered Out Of State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 364 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-07 | Senate | House Calendar Number 655 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 8758 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule A 8639 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Senate Reconsidered |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8639 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-06-05 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2017-04-11 | Senate | File Number 524 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 291 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |