CT SB00605 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To appoint new members to the Board of Directors of the Connecticut Port Authority, place the Connecticut Pilot Commission within the Department of Transportation for administrative purposes only, require an employee of the Department of Transportation who is assigned to the Connecticut Port Authority be compensated from the department's budget and require the Connecticut Port Authority to develop a plan for the transparent and equitable distribution of grants.
Title
An Act Concerning The Port Authority.
Sponsors
House Transportation Committee | Sen. Heather Bond Somers [R] | Rep. Devin Carney [R] | Rep. Travis Simms [D] |
Rep. Holly Cheeseman [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-26 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-14 | Senate | File Number 444 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 282 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |