CT SB00594 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To promote the humane treatment of pets in the state and prevent unfair consumer contracts for the purchase or lease of a cat or dog.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Prohibiting The Use Of Certain Contracts For The Sale Or Lease Of Cats And Dogs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 375 (Y: 148 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 43 PASS (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-19SenatePublic Act 19-82
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateHouse Passed
2019-04-18SenateHouse Calendar Number 460
2019-04-18SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-17SenateSenate Passed
2019-03-28SenateFile Number 219
2019-03-28SenateSenate Calendar Number 118
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-28SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-12SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-08SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-22SenatePublic Hearing 03/01
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Environment
2019-02-20SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-02-11SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback