CT SB00467 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - File Number 479
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - File Number 479
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To extend permitting remote public meetings under the Freedom of Information Act through December 31, 2022.
Title
An Act Permitting Remote Public Meetings Under The Freedom Of Information Act.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Rep. Cristin McCarthy Vahey [D] | Rep. Stephanie Thomas [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Senate | File Number 479 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 335 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |