CT SB00462 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To: (1) Provide increased protections to persons who seek a restraining order under section 46b-15 of the general statutes, (2) establish a task force to study issues relating to the service of such restraining orders by state marshals, and (3) strengthen criminal penalties for the violation of a restraining order or a protective order.
Title
An Act Concerning Civil Restraining And Protective Orders.
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | Rep. Patricia Dillon [D] | Sen. Mae Flexer [D] | Sen. Rick Lopes [D] |
Rep. Kevin Ryan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-24 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-17 | Senate | File Number 615 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 407 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/14 5:00 PM |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/17 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |