CT SB00451 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-18 - File Number 551
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-18 - File Number 551
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a working group to examine the property tax exemption under subdivision (57) of section 12-81 of the general statutes for Class I renewable energy sources that are solar photovoltaic systems.
Title
An Act Concerning A Working Group To Examine The Property Tax Exemption For Solar Photovoltaic Systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | File Number 551 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 325 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/24 5:00 PM |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/01 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |