CT SB00449 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-17 - File Number 531
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-17 - File Number 531
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioners of Economic and Community Development and Revenue Services to study certain taxes imposed by this state.
Title
An Act Concerning A Study Of State Taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | File Number 531 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 309 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/24 5:00 PM |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/28 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |