CT SB00441 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - File Number 539
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - File Number 539
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require a study of issues involving education in Connecticut.
Title
An Act Concerning Parental Engagement In Schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | File Number 539 | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Calendar Number 386 | |
2010-04-14 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-14 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-08 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-04-01 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-01 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-03-30 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-03-30 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-03-30 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-24 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-24 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations | |
2010-03-11 | Public Hearing 03/15 | |
2010-03-10 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |