CT SB00418 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - On Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - On Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To adopt the Uniform Electronic Legal Material Act and the Uniform Certificate of Title for Vessels Act in this state.
Title
An Act Adopting The Uniform Electronic Legal Material Act And The Uniform Certificate Of Title For Vessels Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 446 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | On Consent Calendar | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Passed | |
2012-05-01 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-05-01 | No New File by Committee on Transportation | |
2012-04-30 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-30 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-30 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-04-25 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-04-18 | File Number 530 | |
2012-04-18 | Senate Calendar Number 355 | |
2012-04-18 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-18 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-12 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-04-02 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-02 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-03-15 | Public Hearing 03/19 | |
2012-03-12 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |