CT SB00407 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To add vocational agricultural students enrolled in an internship to the definition of "employee" for purposes of the Workers' Compensation Act.
Title
An Act Establishing A Task Force To Study Workers’ Compensation Coverage For Students Of Regional Agricultural Science And Technology Centers.
Sponsors
House Labor and Public Employees Committee | Sen. Heather Bond Somers [R] | Rep. Cindy Harrison [R] | Rep. Derell Wilson [D] |
Rep. Hubert Delany [D] | Sen. Eric Berthel [R] | Sen. Paul Cicarella [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 265 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 160 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 160 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Special Act 24-16 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2024-05-08 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-08 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-02 | House | House Calendar Number 459 |
2024-05-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4894 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | File Number 352 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 237 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |