CT SB00407 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Joint Favorable
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To increase transparency regarding the utilization, revenue and costs of the New Britain to Hartford busway by requiring legislative approval prior to any expansion of such busway and the submission of biannual reports.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The New Britain To Hartford Busway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-08 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-18SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Transportation
2019-03-15SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-03-08SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-28SenatePublic Hearing 03/04
2019-02-07SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Transportation

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback