CT SB00403 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prevent harm to real and personal property in areas prone to flooding.
Title
An Act Establishing A Task Force To Study Flood Plain Management.
Sponsors
House Planning and Development Committee | Rep. Timothy Bowles [D] | Rep. Noreen Kokoruda [R] | Rep. Thomas Vicino [D] |
Rep. Lonnie Reed [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-25 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2014-04-07 | Senate | File Number 387 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 274 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |