CT SB00394 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-9-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-9-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To ensure quality health care for women.
Title
An Act Establishing A Council On Protecting Women's Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 378 (Y: 142 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 345 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 345 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-19 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-19 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-14 | House | Public Act 19-70 |
2019-06-05 | House | In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | House | House Passed |
2019-06-05 | House | House Calendar Number 728 |
2019-06-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-06-05 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | File Number 214 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 128 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |