CT SB00393 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To place a cap on administrative expenses of the Board of Regents for Higher Education and The University of Connecticut.
Title
An Act Requiring A Report Concerning Institutional Financial Aid From The University Of Connecticut And The Board Of Regents For Higher Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 333 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 269 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 269 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Public Act 15-231 |
2015-06-02 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2015-06-02 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-02 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 628 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-21 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7967 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | File Number 544 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 319 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |