CT SB00390 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-28 - File Number 233
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-28 - File Number 233
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To recognize the importance of pizza to the state's cuisine and economy by designating it as the state food.
Title
An Act Designating Pizza As The State Food.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | Senate | File Number 233 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 158 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |