CT SB00390 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - House Calendar Number 405
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - House Calendar Number 405
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To expand an interagency working group overseeing a two-generation work and academic success pilot program and clarify reporting requirements and other provisions of the program.
Title
An Act Concerning A Two-generation Initiative.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 105 PASS (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 109 PASS (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 109 PASS (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | Senate | House Calendar Number 405 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2016-03-30 | Senate | File Number 330 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 238 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |