CT SB00382 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - House Calendar Number 463
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - House Calendar Number 463
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To substitute the Health Information Technology Officer for the Connecticut Health Insurance Exchange in a statutory provision concerning the consumer health information Internet web site.
Title
An Act Concerning The Consumer Health Information Internet Web Site.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 101 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 103 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 103 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | House Calendar Number 463 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | File Number 337 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 209 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 10:00 AM |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |