CT SB00376 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-7-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-7-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To clarify the right of property owners to construct shoreline flood and erosion control structures.
Title
An Act Concerning The Coastal Management Act And Shoreline Flood And Erosion Control Structures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 305 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-08 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-05-25 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-23 | Public Act 12-101 | |
2012-05-08 | In Concurrence | |
2012-05-08 | On Consent Calendar | |
2012-05-08 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B | |
2012-05-08 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B | |
2012-05-08 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-06 | House Calendar Number 525 | |
2012-05-06 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-05-04 | On Consent Calendar | |
2012-05-04 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B | |
2012-05-04 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 4592 | |
2012-05-04 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4920 | |
2012-04-18 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-18 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |
2012-04-17 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-17 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-16 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-04-10 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |
2012-04-10 | Rules Suspended | |
2012-04-05 | File Number 282 | |
2012-04-05 | Senate Calendar Number 221 | |
2012-04-05 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-05 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-30 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-22 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-21 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-03-09 | Public Hearing 03/16 | |
2012-03-07 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |