CT SB00376 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-14 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-14 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Superior Court to exclude from the amount and sources of income considered in determining orders for (1) alimony or property assignment in an action for marital dissolution, annulment or legal separation, or (2) child support, any disability income received by either party from the United States Department of Veterans Affairs.
Title
An Act Concerning Disability Compensation For Veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-14 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-03-11 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-03-10 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-08 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-08 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary | |
2011-03-04 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs | |
2011-03-03 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-02-03 | Public Hearing 02/10 | |
2011-01-28 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |