CT SB00373 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - File Number 222
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - File Number 222
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) authorize low option benefit design health insurance policies, (2) restrict the Connecticut Health Insurance Exchange's ability to establish requirements with respect to such policies, (3) limit the terms of members of the exchange's board of directors, (4) limit the exchange's ability to provide severance pay to its employees, (5) provide the General Assembly with additional oversight regarding assessments and user fees charged by the exchange, (6) conditionally require the exchange to make available short-term care policies that are not qualified health plans, and (7) eliminate an annual report that the chief executive officer of the exchange is required to file with the Governor and the General Assembly.
Title
An Act Concerning The Connecticut Health Insurance Exchange, Low Option Benefit Design Plans And Short-term Health Insurance Policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Senate | File Number 222 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 155 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |