CT SB00370 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-08 - File Number 308
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-08 - File Number 308
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Mental Health and Addiction Services to establish peer-run respite centers.
Title
An Act Concerning Peer-run Respite Centers For Persons Experiencing A Mental Health Crisis.
Sponsors
House Public Health Committee | Rep. Jeffrey Currey [D] | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] | Rep. Mary Welander [D] |
Rep. Kevin Ryan [D] | Sen. MD Rahman [D] | Rep. Sarah Keitt [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] |
Rep. Kai Belton [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | File Number 308 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 218 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |