CT SB00368 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Public Health
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Public Health
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish an advisory council on Lyme disease and other tick-borne diseases.
Title
An Act Establishing An Advisory Council On Lyme Disease And Other Tick-borne Diseases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Public Health |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-18 | Senate | File Number 556 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 404 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |