CT SB00364 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-10 - Public Hearing 02/15
Pending: Joint Labor and Public Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-10 - Public Hearing 02/15
Pending: Joint Labor and Public Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Labor Commissioner to make recommendations for improvements to the TeleBenefits unemployment compensation claim filing system for individuals who work on a part-time and an on-call basis who are required to file a weekly continued claim whether the individual worked or not.
Title
An Act Concerning The Administration Of Unemployment Compensation Benefits For Certain Individuals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-10 | Public Hearing 02/15 | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |
2011-02-08 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |