CT SB00363 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-10 - File Number 390
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-10 - File Number 390
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the State Board of Education to define "immunization records absence" for the purpose of excluding such absences from the calculation of a school district's chronic absenteeism rate, and to replace the requirement that a meeting be held with a requirement that contact be made with the parent or guardian of a student who is truant.
Title
An Act Concerning A Definition Of Immunization Records Related Absence And Its Exclusion From The Calculation Of A School Or District's Chronic Absenteeism Rate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | File Number 390 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 221 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |