CT SB00358 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require employers to allow employees time away from work to vote on the day of an election.
Title
An Act Concerning Employee Voting Opportunities.
Sponsors
House Labor and Public Employees Committee | Sen. Marilyn Moore [D] | Rep. Robyn Porter [D] | Sen. Julie Kushner [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 28 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7327 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | File Number 440 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 218 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |