CT SB00357 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - Senate Recommitted to Public Safety and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - Senate Recommitted to Public Safety and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To make technical changes concerning gaming.
Title
An Act Concerning Gaming.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Public Safety and Security |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-29 | Senate | File Number 271 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 204 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |