CT SB00353 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require each municipality to hold its biennial municipal election in November, unless a two-thirds vote of such municipality's legislative body decides that such election shall be held in May.
Title
An Act Concerning Municipal Elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-14 | Senate | File Number 442 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 273 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |