CT SB00352 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-16 - Public Hearing 03/20
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-16 - Public Hearing 03/20
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To enable the task force on the humane treatment of animals in municipal animal shelters to continue for another year.
Title
An Act Concerning The Task Force On The Humane Treatment Of Animals In Municipal Animal Shelters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |