CT SB00347 | 2010 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-21 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To establish a set-aside program for veteran-owned small businesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Contractual Bidding Preferences For Veteran-owned Businesses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-21 Referred by Senate to Committee on Transportation
2010-04-12 File Number 472
2010-04-12 Senate Calendar Number 321
2010-04-12 Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2010-04-12 Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2010-04-05 Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/10 10:00 AM
2010-03-25 Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2010-03-24 Joint Favorable Substitute
2010-03-16 Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
2010-03-16 Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
2010-03-15 Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2010-03-11 Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2010-03-11 Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Government Administration and Elections
2010-02-26 Public Hearing 03/02
2010-02-25 Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans Affairs

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback