CT SB00343 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - House Calendar Number 562
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To require the updating of safety plans for certain chemical facilities in the state that are at risk of flooding and other severe weather events as reflected in updated sea level rise projections and to establish a Climate Justice Working Group within the Governor's Council on Climate Change.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Effects Of Climate Change On The Safety Plans Of Certain Chemical Facilities In The State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 233 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-07HouseHouse Calendar Number 562
2018-05-07HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-05-07HouseTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2018-05-07SenateSenate Passed
2018-04-05SenateFile Number 287
2018-04-05SenateSenate Calendar Number 159
2018-04-05SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2018-04-05SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-29SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM
2018-03-23SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-22SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2018-03-09SenatePublic Hearing 03/14
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback