CT SB00329 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - File Number 202
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - File Number 202
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To ensure that the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to higher education has an opportunity to comment on any proposed decreases, increases or maintenance of tuition at public institutions of higher education prior to a vote by the board of trustees on such proposals.
Title
An Act Concerning Student Tuition At Public Institutions Of Higher Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | File Number 202 | |
2010-03-30 | Senate Calendar Number 142 | |
2010-03-30 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-03-30 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-23 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-16 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-16 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-02-26 | Public Hearing 03/04 | |
2010-02-25 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |