CT SB00328 | 2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Joint Favorable
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To: (1) Require the Office of Health Strategy to establish and implement health care cost growth benchmarks in this state; (2) require the Commissioner of Consumer Protection to submit a request to the federal Secretary of Health and Human Services to implement a Canadian prescription drug reimportation program in this state and, if the secretary approves such request, implement such program in this state; (3) implement the Insurance Commissioner's recommendations regarding stop-loss insurance; and (4) require the Office of Health Strategy to seek a state innovation waiver from the federal government to establish a reinsurance program in this state and, if the federal government approves such request, implement such program in this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Health Care Cost Growth Benchmarks, Canadian Drug Reimportation, Stop-loss Insurance And Reinsurance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-13 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10SenateJoint Favorable
2020-03-02SenatePublic Hearing 03/05
2020-02-27SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback