CT SB00320 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-13 - Public Hearing 02/19
Pending: Joint Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-13 - Public Hearing 02/19
Pending: Joint Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prevent consumers of banks and other entities holding their deposits from being exposed to loss of assets held by such banks and other entities prior to adjudication of the respective rights of the parties.
Title
An Act Concerning Liability For Any Loss Of Assets Held By Banks Or Other Entities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |