CT SB00316 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide information to consumers that will allow consumers to avoid the purchase and consumption of products that contain harmful toxins.
Title
An Act Requiring The Labeling Of Food Products That Are Packaged In Materials That Contain Bisphenol-a.
Sponsors
House Environment Committee | Rep. Geoffrey Luxenberg [D] | Rep. Joseph Verrengia [D] | Rep. Philip Miller [D] |
Rep. Elissa Wright [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Senate | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Public Health |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |