CT SB00294 | 2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To require employees of the Department of Children and Families to visit foster homes and the homes of children or youth every sixty days and to require the department to respond to foster families' written special requests in a timely manner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Children And The Department Of Children And Families.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 253 (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 154 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-31 Signed by the Governor
2012-05-18 Transmitted to the Secretary of State
2012-05-11 Public Act 12-58
2012-05-05 In Concurrence
2012-05-05 House Passed
2012-04-20 House Calendar Number 421
2012-04-20 Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2012-04-18 On Consent Calendar
2012-04-18 Senate Passed
2012-04-11 File Number 367
2012-04-11 Senate Calendar Number 274
2012-04-11 Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2012-04-11 Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2012-04-04 Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 5:00 PM
2012-03-26 Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2012-03-22 Joint Favorable
2012-03-14 Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services
2012-03-14 Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services
2012-03-14 Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2012-03-09 Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2012-03-08 Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Human Services
2012-03-01 Public Hearing 03/06
2012-02-29 Referred to Joint Committee on Children

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback