CT SB00294 | 2010 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-08 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To document efforts made by the Commissioner of Children and Families to reunite parents with children, locate relatives and provide long-term foster care placement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Documentation Of Reasonable Efforts To Reunite A Parent With A Child And To Locate Relatives.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-08 Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
2010-04-01 File Number 250
2010-04-01 Senate Calendar Number 183
2010-04-01 Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2010-04-01 Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2010-03-26 Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/10 5:00 PM
2010-03-22 Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2010-03-18 Joint Favorable
2010-03-12 Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services
2010-03-12 Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services
2010-03-11 Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2010-03-10 Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2010-03-09 Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Human Services
2010-02-25 Public Hearing 03/02
2010-02-24 Referred to Joint Committee on Children

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback