CT SB00293 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To remove the requirement that a member of a nationally chartered veterans' service organization must sign a guest book and be sponsored by a member when entering a club operated by the organization that is not the guest's home club.
Title
An Act Concerning Clubs Operated By Nationally Chartered Veterans' Service Organizations.
Sponsors
House Veterans' Affairs Committee | Rep. Kim Rose [D] | Rep. Michael Molgano [R] | Rep. Christopher Davis [R] |
Rep. David Rutigliano [R] | Rep. Christie Carpino [R] | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] | Sen. Joseph Crisco [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 302 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 375 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 375 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Public Act 14-114 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Passed |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Calendar Number 545 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-14 | Senate | No New File by Committee on General Law |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law |
2014-03-27 | Senate | File Number 176 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 140 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |