CT SB00291 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-11 - Public Hearing 04/15
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-11 - Public Hearing 04/15
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) require Judicial Branch officials to conduct inquiries of the parties to a proceeding to ascertain whether circumstances exist that would result in the disqualification of the judge or family magistrate, and (2) permit the office of the Attorney General to investigate complaints of wrong doing in municipal police departments.
Title
An Act Concerning Procedures For Determining The Potential Disqualification Of A Judicial Branch Official And Establishing A Process That Allows The Office Of The Attorney General To Review Complaints Of Wrongdoing By Municipal Police Departments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/15 |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |