CT SB00289 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-05 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-05 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To exempt not more than sixty thousand dollars in home health care expenses from state income tax.
Title
An Act Providing A State Income Tax Exemption For The Cost Of Home Health Care Services And Supplies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2015-03-23 | Senate | File Number 146 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 143 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/10 |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |