CT SB00244 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - File Number 709
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - File Number 709
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide an increase in rates for providers who serve senior citizens and disabled persons.
Title
An Act Increasing Home Care Provider Rates.
Sponsors
House Aging Committee | Rep. John Hampton [D] | Rep. Michelle Cook [D] | Rep. David Zoni [D] |
Rep. Joseph Verrengia [D] | Sen. Catherine Osten [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Senate | File Number 709 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-29 | Senate | New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/28/14 5:00 PM |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-11 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Human Services |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services |
2014-03-27 | Senate | File Number 174 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 138 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |