CT SB00227 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To permit the State Elections Enforcement Commission to inspect the bank statements of any candidate committee that it is not auditing in order to ensure proper distribution of surplus funds or to discover major improprieties with campaign funds.
Title
An Act Concerning State Elections Enforcement Commission Committee Review.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-01 | Senate | File Number 221 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 183 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |