CT SB00223 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - File Number 53
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - File Number 53
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Workers' Compensation Commission to study the workers' compensation system in the state.
Title
An Act Concerning Workers' Compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | File Number 53 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 66 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |