CT SB00222 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To classify fewer state employees as managers.
Title
An Act Concerning The Definition Of Managerial Employee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-23 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2014-04-02 | Senate | File Number 272 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 213 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |