CT SB00207 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-12-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-12-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To reduce the recent increase in hunting and fishing fees to a twenty per cent increase, increase the fine for failure to wear a seat belt, increase the fine for certain motor vehicle infractions and create a new limited operator's permit that allows people who have been convicted of driving under the influence to drive to work and to school.
Title
An Act Authorizing The Hunting Of Deer By Revolver And Establishing Certain Credits Toward The Purchase Of Hunting And Fishing Licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 230 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A, B (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 229 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A, B (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 228 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 4297 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 229 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A, B (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 228 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 4297 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-02 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-05-19 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2010-05-14 | Public Act 10-99 | |
2010-05-04 | In Concurrence | |
2010-05-04 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B | |
2010-05-04 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A,B | |
2010-04-29 | House Calendar Number 453 | |
2010-04-29 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Reconsidered | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 4297 | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4404 | |
2010-04-22 | File Number 616 | |
2010-04-22 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-22 | New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2010-04-22 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-16 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/21/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-04-14 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-14 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-04-08 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2010-04-01 | File Number 244 | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Calendar Number 176 | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-01 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-26 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-19 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-17 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-03-02 | Public Hearing 03/08 | |
2010-02-18 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |