CT SB00203 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - Joint Favorable
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - Joint Favorable
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To make Connecticut Clean Energy Fund Programs accessible to condominium associations.
Title
An Act Permitting Condominium Associations To Benefit From Clean Energy Fund Programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-29 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-29 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2010-04-29 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-29 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-27 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2010-04-21 | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-14 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-08 | File Number 388 | |
2010-04-08 | Senate Calendar Number 254 | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-08 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-01 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-24 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-23 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-03-12 | Public Hearing 03/18 | |
2010-02-18 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |